Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 165 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17968 Week
» 70984 Month
» 190511 Year
» 3217364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3763 |
18/04/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08596 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1974 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/04/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
05/1974 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/04/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3763 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Preston (24K) |
|
|
30/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (OX) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08596 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (RG) |
|
|
07/08/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
12/1976 |
To Store |
To Store (Old Oak Common) |
|
|
12/03/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08596 from Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|