Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1267 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19070 Week
» 72086 Month
» 191613 Year
» 3218466 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3757 |
05/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08590 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
05/10/1959 to Danygraig (87C) |
Withdrawn |
27/09/1993 |
Time in Service |
33 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/10/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3757 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08590 |
|
|
27/09/1993 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|