Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 309 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14352 Week
» 79306 Month
» 281970 Year
» 3308823 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3753 |
07/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08586 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
07/09/1959 to Danygraig (87C) |
Withdrawn |
01/03/1996 |
Time in Service |
36 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys |
Cut Up |
05/2000 |
Cut At |
EMR (at Ayr MPD) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/09/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3753 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
23/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08586 |
|
|
04/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Margam (MG) |
|
|
30/11/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
24/07/1988 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
01/03/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08586 |
|
|
05/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: at Ayr MPD |
|
|