Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3314 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16720 Week
» 69736 Month
» 189263 Year
» 3216116 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3752 |
22/08/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08585 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
22/08/1959 to Danygraig (87C) |
Withdrawn |
05/10/1981 off Bescot (BS) |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/08/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3752 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08585 |
|
|
05/10/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08585 from Bescot (BS) |
|
|