Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 1036 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31686 Week
» 130331 Month
» 332995 Year
» 3359848 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D375 |
31/01/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40175 |
17/09/1973 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
02/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/01/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
02/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/01/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D375 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
15/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
17/09/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40175 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
10/07/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
31/05/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40175 from Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
02/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|