Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 643 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6427 Week
» 27816 Month
» 147343 Year
» 3174196 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3743 |
20/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08576 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/06/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3743 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (DG) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08576 |
|
|
22/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
10/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Blazey (BZ) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
30/04/2006 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08576 |
|
|
05/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|