Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4058 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17464 Week
» 70480 Month
» 190007 Year
» 3216860 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3742 |
13/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08575 |
09/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/06/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3742 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Dalry Road (64C) |
|
|
29/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
16/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) |
|
|
30/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08575 |
|
|