Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 887 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18690 Week
» 71706 Month
» 191233 Year
» 3218086 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3738 |
05/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08571 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/06/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3738 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Dalry Road (64C) |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
27/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
03/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (GM) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08571 |
|
|