Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 394 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18197 Week
» 71213 Month
» 190740 Year
» 3217593 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3737 |
08/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08570 |
04/1975 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/05/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3737 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Dalry Road (64C) |
|
|
30/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
01/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
04/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08570 |
|
|
18/01/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08570 from Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
09/09/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: at Motherwell MPD |
|
|