Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 863 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19774 Week
» 84728 Month
» 287392 Year
» 3314245 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3729 |
24/01/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08562 |
29/11/1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/01/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/01/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3729 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
29/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08562 |
|
|
31/01/1994 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08562 from Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
29/08/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Old Oak Common TMD |
|
|