Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1208 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14614 Week
» 67630 Month
» 187157 Year
» 3214010 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3723 |
30/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08556 |
02/02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/10/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
30/10/1959 |
Power Unit IH4457 |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3723 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08556 |
|
|
05/1977 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
05/1977 |
To Store |
To Store (Finsbury Park) |
|
|
31/03/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (SU) |
|
|
03/07/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08556 from Willesden (WN) |
|
|
23/10/1993 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|