Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2103 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 7256 Week
» 142072 Month
» 344736 Year
» 3371589 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3722 |
on |
12/02/1937 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
299 |
To Service |
Mon 12/02/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/05/1962 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/02/1937 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3722 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oxford (OXF) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
21/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3722 |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|