Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1638 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19441 Week
» 72457 Month
» 191984 Year
» 3218837 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3722 |
23/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08555 |
26/01/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/10/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
23/10/1959 |
Power Unit IH4454 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3722 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08555 |
|
|
15/08/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08555 from Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
12/11/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|