Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2571 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15977 Week
» 68993 Month
» 188520 Year
» 3215373 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3717 |
13/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08553 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/10/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
13/10/1959 |
Power Unit IH4447 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3717 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08553 |
|
|
31/05/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08553 from Cambridge (CA) |
|
|
03/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|