Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 557 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19468 Week
» 84422 Month
» 287086 Year
» 3313939 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3716 |
28/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08552 |
07/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/09/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
28/09/1959 |
Power Unit IH4442 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3716 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
02/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08552 |
|
|
15/08/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08552 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
01/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|