Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3346 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16752 Week
» 69768 Month
» 189295 Year
» 3216148 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3713 |
03/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08549 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/09/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
03/09/1959 |
Power Unit IH4430 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3713 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08549 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
24/11/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08549 from March (MR) |
|
|
16/10/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|