Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 126 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17929 Week
» 70945 Month
» 190472 Year
» 3217325 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3711 |
14/08/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08547 |
05/01/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/08/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
14/08/1959 |
Power Unit IH4417 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3711 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
15/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
05/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08547 |
|
|
30/08/1981 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
20/12/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08547 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
05/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|