Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2940 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16346 Week
» 69362 Month
» 188889 Year
» 3215742 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3709 |
10/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08545 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/07/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
10/07/1959 |
Power Unit IH4404 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3709 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
29/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
08/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08545 |
|
|
28/09/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08545 from Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
05/11/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|