Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2765 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16171 Week
» 69187 Month
» 188714 Year
» 3215567 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3706 |
15/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08542 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
20/08/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/06/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
20/08/1971 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
15/06/1959 |
Power Unit IH4306 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3706 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
20/08/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/09/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08542 |
|
|
31/08/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08542 |
|
|
30/04/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|