Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3699 |
07/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08535 |
06/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
31/12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/05/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
31/12/1971 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
07/05/1959 |
Power Unit IH4345 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3699 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
12/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
02/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
31/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
26/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (BY) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08535 |
|
|
13/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
01/10/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08535 |
|
|
09/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|