Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2236 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20039 Week
» 73055 Month
» 192582 Year
» 3219435 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3697 |
01/05/1959 |
|
Pre TOPS (Class 13) |
D4502 |
08/1965 |
|
TOPS (TOPS) |
13002 |
1973 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 07/1975 |
|
Slow Speed Indicator fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/05/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
01/05/1959 |
Power Unit IH4346 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3697 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
08/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
08/1965 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4502 |
|
|
1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 13002 |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Slow Speed Indicator fitted |
|
|