Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2198 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20001 Week
» 73017 Month
» 192544 Year
» 3219397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3688 |
27/02/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08526 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
30/10/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/02/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
30/10/1971 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
27/02/1959 |
Power Unit IH4333 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/02/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3688 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
30/10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
13/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08526 |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08526 |
|
|
03/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|