Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1849 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15892 Week
» 80846 Month
» 283510 Year
» 3310363 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3687 |
24/02/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08525 |
01/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
16/09/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/02/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
16/09/1971 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
24/02/1959 |
Power Unit IH4330 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/02/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3687 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
28/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
03/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
09/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
16/09/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
25/09/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08525 |
|
|