Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 621 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31271 Week
» 129916 Month
» 332580 Year
» 3359433 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3685 |
06/09/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08523 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/09/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3685 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08523 |
|
|
08/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|