Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 3169 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17212 Week
» 82166 Month
» 284830 Year
» 3311683 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3679 |
on |
06/07/1940 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
325 |
To Service |
Fri 06/07/1940 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 01/03/1963 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys |
Total Mileage |
455,410 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/11/1959 |
Landore MPD |
With four Fowler 2-6-4Ts in Derby Works, three Stanier 2-6-4Ts have had to be borrowed for the Central Wales LNW line viz. 42296, 42645/51 from Agecroft. At Swansea East Dock, 1641/52 an 6763 have been placed in store while at Danygraig six displaced Panthers have been transferred to the S.R. at Exmouth Junc. viz. 3633/79, 4666/81/94. |
SLS/196001 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/07/1940 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3679 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea East Dock (SED) |
|
|
08/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
26/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wadebridge (72F) |
|
|
31/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
01/03/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3679 |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|