Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1536 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7320 Week
» 28709 Month
» 148236 Year
» 3175089 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3668 |
17/02/1959 |
|
TOPS (09/0) |
09004 |
12/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
09 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
17/02/1959 to Eastleigh (71A) |
Withdrawn |
31/07/2007 |
Time in Service |
48 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
17/02/1959 |
Power Unit IH4327 |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/02/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3668 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
26/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
06/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
08/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 09004 |
|
|
31/07/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 09004 |
|
|