Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 129 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17932 Week
» 70948 Month
» 190475 Year
» 3217328 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3665 |
02/02/1959 |
|
TOPS (09/0) |
09001 |
12/1973 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
02/02/1959 |
Power Unit IH4310 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/02/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3665 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
24/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
10/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 09001 |
|
|
28/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (SU) |
|
|