Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 901 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18704 Week
» 71720 Month
» 191247 Year
» 3218100 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3661 |
06/06/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08506 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1978 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1978 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/06/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
03/1978 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
fA |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/06/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3661 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
25/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08506 |
|
|
15/08/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (DN) |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08506 |
|
|
07/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|