Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4176 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17582 Week
» 70598 Month
» 190125 Year
» 3216978 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3659 |
24/05/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08504 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/05/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/05/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3659 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08504 |
|
|
08/1977 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
09/1977 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
30/10/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08504 from Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
23/09/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|