Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2967 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16373 Week
» 69389 Month
» 188916 Year
» 3215769 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3605 |
14/11/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08490 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/11/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/11/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3605 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
16/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Margam (87B) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
03/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
24/01/1970 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
21/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
07/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
28/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08490 |
|
|
04/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (CH) |
|
|
18/12/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08490 from Thornton Junction (TJ) |
|
|