Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1640 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15046 Week
» 68062 Month
» 187589 Year
» 3214442 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3604 |
07/11/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08489 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1977 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/11/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
11/1977 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
fA |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/11/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3604 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08489 |
|
|
29/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (SW) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
30/09/2008 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08489 |
|
|
05/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|