Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3314 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16720 Week
» 69736 Month
» 189263 Year
» 3216116 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3603 |
31/10/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08488 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/10/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/10/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3603 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08488 |
|
|
29/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
16/02/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08488 from Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
21/04/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|