Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1109 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18912 Week
» 71928 Month
» 191455 Year
» 3218308 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3602 |
29/10/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08487 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/10/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/10/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3602 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
30/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08487 |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (SW) |
|
|
11/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
23/02/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08487 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
25/06/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|