Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2274 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20077 Week
» 73093 Month
» 192620 Year
» 3219473 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3600 |
20/10/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08485 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 03/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1978 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1978 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/10/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
03/1978 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
fA |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/10/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3600 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
30/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08485 |
|
|
12/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
18/04/1988 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
12/05/1988 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|