Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1689 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15095 Week
» 68111 Month
» 187638 Year
» 3214491 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3594 |
01/09/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08479 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/09/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3594 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
03/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08479 |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
04/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
08/11/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08479 from Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|