Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2313 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15719 Week
» 68735 Month
» 188262 Year
» 3215115 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3580 |
01/10/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08465 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 03/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/10/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/10/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3580 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Preston (24K) |
|
|
25/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (11B) |
|
|
15/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
15/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08465 |
|
|
03/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BC) |
|
|
04/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (CH) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
09/08/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08465 from Derby (DY) |
|
|
08/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|