Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1067 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14473 Week
» 67489 Month
» 187016 Year
» 3213869 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3577 |
28/08/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08462 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/08/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/08/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3577 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
09/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08462 |
|
|