Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19241 Week
» 72257 Month
» 191784 Year
» 3218637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3572 |
03/01/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08457 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/01/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
05/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/01/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3572 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
02/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08457 |
|
|
05/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
01/09/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08457 from Swindon Works (ZL) |
|
|
05/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|