Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 681 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14087 Week
» 67103 Month
» 186630 Year
» 3213483 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3568 |
12/12/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08453 |
09/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/12/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/12/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3568 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
18/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
19/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
03/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08453 |
|
|
05/10/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08453 from York (North) (YK) |
|
|
08/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|