Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1447 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7231 Week
» 28620 Month
» 148147 Year
» 3175000 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3562 |
28/11/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08447 |
09/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
28/11/1958 to Parkhead (65C) |
Withdrawn |
11/11/1994 |
Time in Service |
35 yrs, 11 mths , 14 dys |
Cut Up |
06/12/1994 |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/11/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/11/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3562 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
05/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08447 |
|
|
24/07/1988 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
11/11/1994 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|
06/12/1994 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|