Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1825 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19628 Week
» 72644 Month
» 192171 Year
» 3219024 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3560 |
14/11/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08445 |
04/1975 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
14/11/1958 to Haymarket (64B) |
Withdrawn |
20/07/2001 |
Time in Service |
42 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1977 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/11/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
09/1977 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/11/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3560 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) |
|
|
30/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
24/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
29/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
01/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
27/09/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
01/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
01/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C) |
|
|
04/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08445 |
|
|
09/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
20/07/2001 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08445 |
|
|