Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1685 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19488 Week
» 72504 Month
» 192031 Year
» 3218884 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D356 |
23/08/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40156 |
22/12/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3102/D652 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
23/08/1961 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
27/07/1980 |
Time in Service |
18 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
12/1980 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Information |
Loco due a classified repair,and bogie fractures |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
23/08/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/08/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/08/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D356 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3102 Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
03/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
22/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40156 |
|
|
27/07/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40156 |
|
|
12/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|