Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1686 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15092 Week
» 68108 Month
» 187635 Year
» 3214488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3540 |
22/08/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08425 |
04/1975 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/08/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/08/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3540 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Stirling (63B) |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
29/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
26/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C) |
|
|
04/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08425 |
|
|
09/09/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08425 from Thornton Junction (TJ) |
|
|
07/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|