Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 4085 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 25119 Week
» 123764 Month
» 326428 Year
» 3353281 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3539 |
15/08/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08424 |
12/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/08/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/08/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3539 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Stirling (63B) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
29/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (DE) |
|
|
12/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08424 |
|
|
10/06/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08424 from Thornton Junction (TJ) |
|
|
12/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J R Adams: Glasgow |
|
|