Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1433 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7217 Week
» 28606 Month
» 148133 Year
» 3174986 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3538 |
15/08/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08423 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/08/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/08/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3538 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Stirling (63B) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
18/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
02/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08423 |
|
|
24/11/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08423 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|