Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1860 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15266 Week
» 68282 Month
» 187809 Year
» 3214662 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3534 |
11/07/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08419 |
07/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/07/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/07/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3534 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Balloch (65I) |
|
|
13/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
08/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08419 |
|
|
24/07/1988 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
23/04/1993 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|
27/11/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|