Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3898 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17304 Week
» 70320 Month
» 189847 Year
» 3216700 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3523 |
13/06/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08408 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/06/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/06/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3523 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
08/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Margam (87B) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
09/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08408 |
|
|
29/04/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08408 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
06/10/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|