Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 744 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24375 Week
» 89329 Month
» 291993 Year
» 3318846 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3520 |
06/06/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08405 |
02/02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1978 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1978 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/06/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/1978 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
fA |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/06/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3520 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
01/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Margam (87B) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08405 |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|