Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 578 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 17441 Week
» 8497 Month
» 354921 Year
» 3381774 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3519 |
30/05/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08404 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 09/1975 |
|
Slow Speed Indicator fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/05/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/05/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3519 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
01/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exeter (83C) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D) |
|
|
31/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
24/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08404 |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Slow Speed Indicator fitted |
|
|
27/07/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08404 from Frodingham (FH) |
|
|
01/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|