Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1982 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15388 Week
» 68404 Month
» 187931 Year
» 3214784 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3510 |
02/05/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08395 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 05/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/05/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/05/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3510 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Truro (83F) |
|
|
08/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
19/06/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
15/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08395 |
|
|
27/07/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08395 from Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
30/04/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|